2 + 2 = 4.

That's about as much math as I can handle without a calculator on a daily basis. I literally hate doing math more than anything in life, mostly because I'm not good at it—and I hate doing things I'm not good at.

So, when I come across a cool math trick online that claims to make life easier for folks like me, I'm all ears. While calculus is (basically) useless for the average person's everyday life, multiplication, addition, subtraction, and percentages are all things we should be able to do—and without a calculator.

As a big fan of TED Talks, I came across the following video of Gaurav Tekriwal showcasing the benefits of something called Vedic mathematics, which is basic a set of strategies to help simplify difficult calculations.

Although the origins of these teachings are somewhat mysterious, the strategies are quite effective, and something I will remember on a daily basis. Maybe math isn't so hard after all?

Here are some of the tips and tricks covered.

## How to Multiply Double-Digit Numbers by 11

My multiplication table stopped at 10, so beyond that, I'm making calculations based off my memory or counting in my head. However, using Vedic math, multiplying by 11 is a piece of cake.

All you need to do is add the digits of the number you are multiplying by 11 and place that in the middle of the original number. If the sum of the digits is 10 or larger, simply carry it over. Better to see it than me write it.

See how easy that was? Basically, if you know how to add, you know how to multiple by 11.

Now, let's look at another example.

**11 x 11**

Just separate the number being multiplied by **11** (in this case, also **11**) so that there's room for your number in-between. Now, just add the two digits in that number together (**1 + 1 = 2**) and throw the sum in that space you left open. That gives you **121**.

**58 x 11**

Just add **5 + 8**, which gives you **13**. The slide it in-between the **5** and **8** and you get **5138**. But, that's not right, since you need to carry that one over. Go ahead and carry it over and you'll end up with **638**.

Needless to say, I feel like a complete badass now that I know this.

## How to Multiply Numbers Close to the Power of 10

This base method uses the powers of 10 (tens, hundreds, thousands, etc.) and cross subtracts and multiplies the sums. Again, much better to see what I am saying then trying to read it. Here's an example of multiplying two, two-digit numbers (a base of hundreds).

What Gaurav does is quite simple actually.

**99 x 97**

He takes the difference of each number from 100 and places those numbers in the right-hand column (**99 - 100 = -01** and **97 - 100 = -03**).

Then he cross-adds one set of numbers (either pair would work) to get the first number of the answer. So, **99 + -03** or **97 + -01** = **96**. So, that'd be the first part of the answer.

Now multiply the two smaller numbers (**-01 x -03**) to get the second part of the answer. **-01 x -03 = 03**. So, that makes the answer **9603**.

Pretty awesome right?

This same method works for any base of ten. **999 x 987** or **9,878 x 9,999** would all work using a base of 1,000 and 10,000 respectively. You can see this at around the 3:45 mark in the video.

## How to Multiple Double-Digits by Any Other Double-Digits

The cool thing about math is watching how seemingly impossible combinations seem to walk out perfectly in the end. By doing certain operations, you can turn wildly complex equations into simple, step-by-step solutions.

Using the Vertical and Crosswise Pattern, we can easily multiply large two-digit numbers like the one pictured below.

Instead of doing the standing method of multiplication, we are going to separate and conquer.

**12 x 34**

First, we multiply vertically up the right side. **2 x 4 = 8**. So, **8** will be the last digit in our answer.

Next, we cross-multiply. **3 x 2 = 6** and **4 x 1 = 4**. Now add **6 + 4** to get **10**. Carry over the **1** like you normally would, and you are left with **0**, which will go in front of the **8** we already have.

So, as of now you should have **08** in you answer line.

Lastly, we vertically multiply up the left side. **3 x 1 = 3** and add the carried **1**. Place that in the front of our answer line and we get **408**.

## How to Multiply Using Lines Instead of Numbers

If you're more of a visual learner that really hates numbers, you can also go all Japanese on them and substitute those digits for lines, like YouTuber kimelicious does. I'm not going to explain this one—just watch and you'll see.

## Don't You Love Math Now?

There are some really amazing math tricks using Vedic-style mathematics, so be sure to watch the full video to get a firmer grasp on it and start using it in your everyday life.

Do you have any cool math tricks of your own? Let us know in the comments section.

**Want to master Microsoft Excel and take your work-from-home job prospects to the next level?** Jump-start your career with our Premium A-to-Z Microsoft Excel Training Bundle from the new Gadget Hacks Shop and get lifetime access to more than 40 hours of Basic to Advanced instruction on functions, formula, tools, and more.

Other worthwhile deals to check out:

- 97% off The Ultimate 2021 White Hat Hacker Certification Bundle
- 98% off The 2021 Accounting Mastery Bootcamp Bundle
- 99% off The 2021 All-in-One Data Scientist Mega Bundle
- 59% off XSplit VCam: Lifetime Subscription (Windows)
- 98% off The 2021 Premium Learn To Code Certification Bundle
- 62% off MindMaster Mind Mapping Software: Perpetual License
- 41% off NetSpot Home Wi-Fi Analyzer: Lifetime Upgrades

## 7 Comments

But 13 x 24 is 312. You mean 12 x 34.

Thanks, good catch! Those changes have been made.

Does that line thing only work when there are the same amounts of digits?

Does that work with problems that ends with 0 at the end of the answer? Just wondering. I just want to learn the new way to do math. I do know the old way of doing multiplications.

what is short trick of multiple

Please send the shortcut method of this type of multiplication

3

333333333333333333I have found a new and very fast way to square any number, which I suppose to have patent with me..I have discussed this with many mathematicians including professors , and verified that it is not taught or found anywhere.. But how can I share it here , unless i am sure of the patent to be with me, since this could be a new invention.. Please contact..

So these math techniques do not work for every number. Seems like only numbers that are alike in some way or small numbers. I tried to do 27x34 and got the same answer with all the techniques but the answers were not right. Could you possibly show other numbers besides small numbers.

## Share Your Thoughts